Case: A-5618
A-5618
01/05/1956
Application for Writ of Error
ROY A. SCOTT, ET AL.
MARSHALL P. GRAHAM, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/09/1956 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
03/06/1956 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
01/09/1956 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/05/1956 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/09/1956 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/27/1956 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
06/27/1956 | Opinion issued | | ||
03/06/1956 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
02/08/1956 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
01/09/1956 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/05/1956 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
01/05/1956 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Marshall P. Graham, et al. | Respondent | |
Roy A. Scott, et al. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information