Case Information: 58179 | |||
Short Caption: | DERIJK (MILO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CR 10-5822 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/18/2011 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
04/18/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to all counsel.) State of Nevada Vs. Milo Casper Derijk | 11-11580 | |
04/18/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | 11-11582 | |
04/19/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 4/4/11. Court Reporter: Kathy Brumm. Filed in district court on: 4/18/11. | 11-11655 | |
04/21/2011 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kathy Brumm stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/4/11. | 11-11904 | |
04/25/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 11-12160 | |
04/25/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement CD-ROM included. | 11-12161 | |
05/05/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 11-13292 | |
05/27/2011 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. No Reply Brief Filed. | ||
09/14/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming and Vacating in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED AND VACATED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." | 11-28030 | |
10/11/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-31135 | |
10/11/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
10/13/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 12, 2011. | 11-31135 |