Case Information: 58170 | |||
Short Caption: | WALKER (TYRONE) VS. WILLIAMS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A632160 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/27/2011 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/18/2011 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
04/18/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. A632160 WALKER | 11-11490 | |
05/05/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due date: 10 days. Findings of Fact, Conclusion of Law and Order filed on or about 04/25/2011. | 11-13358 | |
05/12/2011 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Findings of Fact, Conculsions of Law and Order filed on 04/25/2011. | 11-14158 | |
07/21/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. | 11-21979 | |
07/27/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. | 11-22621 | |
07/27/2011 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/07/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." | 11-37462 | |
01/03/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-00030 | |
01/03/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/13/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 10, 2012. | 12-00030 |