judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ELSIE L. BRAUNSTEIN v. ROBINSON FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP LLP

Case Heading (S-08-0115)
Case Number:S-08-0115Case Docketed On:06/02/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Crook CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:ELSIE L. BRAUNSTEIN v. ROBINSON FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP LLP
Full Title:ELSIE L. BRAUNSTEIN, Appellant (Defendant), v. ROBINSON FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP LLP, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantElsie L. BraunsteinPaul J. Drew
Anita Ann Czapeczka
AppelleeRobinson Family Limited Partnership LLPMax S. Main

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property - Real - Adverse Possession
Opinion Number:2010 WY 26
Citation:226 P.3d 826

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/02/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/02/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/21/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/24/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time - briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/24/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/04/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/05/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion for extension of timeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/06/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/07/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/08/2008Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
08/08/2008Event - Hardcopy received third motion for extension of timeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/15/2008Event - Other - received email from Mr. Drew regarding late filing of brief.EventOtherFinal
08/15/2008Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
08/15/2008Event - Rejected Filing - Brief of Appellant (untimely)EventRejected FilingFinal
08/15/2008Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
08/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant (no action taken, e-filing was rejected because untimely)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/02/2008Motion - Accept late filing (actually motion for reinstatement of appeal) with memorandum in support of motion.MotionAccept late filingFinal
09/04/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion to reinstate appeal and memorandum in support of motionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/17/2008Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
09/19/2008Event - Hardcopy received appellee's objections to motion for reinstatement and brief in support of objectionsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/24/2008Order - Other - order reinstating appeal, hard copies of brief filed this date per orderOrderOtherFinal
09/24/2008Brief - Appellant and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
10/23/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/29/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/07/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/10/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/14/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/20/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Paul Drew for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/20/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volumes I & II, Original Papers; Volume III, Deposition TranscriptRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
12/01/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Max Main for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/18/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full Court (Paul J. Drew and Anita Ann Czapeczka, argument by Mr. Drew for appellant; Max S. Main for appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
12/18/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/18/2008Notice-Internal - Other - Partial digital recording (approx. 45 min), system shut down during argumentNotice-InternalOtherFinal
03/08/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/24/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/24/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/24/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/24/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/26/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/25/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal