judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALI ASGHA MARVI V. D.C. TAXICAB COMMISSION

Case Information: 10-CV-1275
Short Caption:ALI ASGHA MARVI V. D.C. TAXICAB COMMISSIONClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB3193-10Filed Date:10/12/2010

Opening Event Date:10/12/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/30/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAsgha Ali Marvi YPro SeN
AppelleeD.C. Taxicab CommissionN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/12/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/03/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed as having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4 (a). (BY: ETW)
11/03/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
11/23/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
12/09/2010 ORDRED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as UNTIMELY filed. See DC App. R. 4(a)(1) (RZNBTE) (rm)
12/09/2010DISMISSED
12/09/2010RECEIVED - aple's motion to dismiss appeal for want of jurisdiction
12/16/2010 On consideration of appellee's motion to dismiss for want of jurisdiction, and upon further consideration of this court's order of December 9, 2010, which dismissed this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellee's motion is denied as moot. (ETW) elp
12/30/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived