Administrative Case: ADKT 0221 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: RESCINDING APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER (WHITEHEAD) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Classification: | Administrative - ADKT - ADKT | Case Status: | Case Closed |
Filed Date: | 09/07/1995 | Public Hearing: | |
Closed Date: | 08/07/1996 |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/07/1995 | Administrative Case | Filed Petition. The clerk is directed to schedule a public hearing on September 15, 1995. | 95-00030 | |
09/13/1995 | Administrative Case | Filed Order allowing camera in the courtroom. | 95-00033 | |
09/14/1995 | Administrative Case | Filed Order allowing electronic coverage and designating Bob Harmon as pool coordinator. | 95-00034 | |
09/15/1995 | Administrative Case | Filed Opposition to Administrative Order Terminating Appointment of Master. | 95-00035 | |
09/15/1995 | Administrative Case | Filed Opposition to Administrative Order Terminating Appointment of Master. | 95-00036 | |
09/15/1995 | Administrative Case | Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. Justices Steffen and Springer did not participate. | ||
09/15/1995 | Administrative Case | Filed Order Granting Petition and Vacating Order Appointing Special Master. | 95-00037 | |
12/28/1995 | Administrative Case | Filed Order Clarifying the Order entered September 15, 1995 Granting Petition and Vacating Order Appointing Special Master. | 95-00038 | |
07/12/1996 | Administrative Case | Filed Opinion-"Response to Supplemental Opinion filed July 5, 1996, under case no. 24598." Per Curiam. Young/Shearing/Rose. 112 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 106. Nos. 24598/ADKT 221 | 96-00075 | |
07/19/1996 | Administrative Case | Filed Letter from Herbert F. Ahlswede in response to July 12, 1996, opinion. | 96-00076 | |
08/07/1996 | Administrative Case | Filed Letter from Herbert F. Ahlswede in response to July 12, 1996, opinion. | 96-00077 | |
08/07/1996 | Administrative Case | Case Closed. |