judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEENER MANAGEMENT COMPANY V. LARRY IMHOFF

Case Information: 10-CV-1274
Short Caption:KEENER MANAGEMENT COMPANY V. LARRY IMHOFFClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB3544-10Filed Date:10/08/2010

Opening Event Date:10/08/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/16/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKeener Management CompanyN
Mark R. RaddatzNY
AppelleeLarry Imhoff N
Beth Mellen HarrisonNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/03/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been PREMATURELY FILED as the case remains pending in the trial court. See DC Code 11-721 (2001);... (BY: ETW)
11/18/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (titled as: withdrawing appeal without prejudice)
11/24/2010 On consideration of this court's November 3, 2010 order which directed appellant to show cause ...and APPELLANT'S SUBSEQUENTLY FILED MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEAL, it is ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW IS GRANTED and this APPEAL is HEREBY DISMISSED W/O PREJUDICE to counsel filing a new appeal once all matters in the trial court have been resolved. (BY: ETW)
11/24/2010DISMISSED
12/16/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived