Case Information: 38244 | |||
Short Caption: | WALKER (RICHARD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR002168C | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/27/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
07/27/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 01-12740 | |
08/23/2001 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: April 24, 2001 and July 12, 2001. Court Reporters: Debora L. Cecere and Wendy L. Pearson. | 01-14326 | |
09/04/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 01-14890 | |
09/04/2001 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 01-14891 | |
09/04/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Transmission of Original Sealed Exhibits Including Pre-Sentence Investigation Report. | 01-14892 | |
09/21/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed September 4, 2001. The clerk of the district court is directed to forward a certified copy of the sealed exhibits, including the presentence report, in a sealed envelope, for filing and consideration with the appendix. | 01-16014 | |
09/25/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 01-16173 | |
09/27/2001 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibits (copies). Certified Copies of Pre-Sentence Report and Documentary Exhibits. | 01-16319 | |
10/10/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 01-17082 | |
11/06/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Exhibits: Certified Copies of Pre-Sentence Report and Documentary Exhibits this day. | 01-17317 | |
11/06/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/09/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 7, 2001. | 01-17317 |