judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WALKER PATTERSON INMAN, JR. v. DAISHA LORAINE WILLIAMS, f/k/a DAISHA LORAINE INMAN

Case Heading (S-08-0114)
Case Number:S-08-0114Case Docketed On:06/02/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:WALKER PATTERSON INMAN, JR. v. DAISHA LORAINE WILLIAMS, f/k/a DAISHA LORAINE INMAN
Full Title:WALKER PATTERSON INMAN, JR., Appellant (Plaintiff), v. DAISHA LORAINE WILLIAMS, f/k/a DAISHA LORAINE INMAN, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWalker Patterson Inman Jr.John D. Bowers
Joshua Tyler Smith
AppelleeDaisha Loraine WilliamsWilliam L. Combs
Other Particpants
Guardian ad litemJean A. Day

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/02/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/02/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Justice BurkeNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
06/03/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Chief Justice VoigtNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
07/21/2008Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
07/23/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to DismissEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/28/2008Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
07/28/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal