Case Information: 58167 | |||
Short Caption: | GARCIA-ROBLES VS. AVILES | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A533649 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/26/2011 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/15/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. | ||
04/15/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. AVILES VS. GARCIA-ROBLES - A533649 | 11-11424 | |
04/15/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | 11-11426 | |
04/21/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Claims Professionals. Check No. 3482. | ||
04/21/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | 11-11929 | |
04/26/2011 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. | 11-12324 | |
05/09/2011 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 11-13572 | |
05/10/2011 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/7/11 | 11-13809 | |
06/15/2011 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 14, 2011. | 11-17759 | |
11/07/2011 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 11-34232 | |
11/16/2011 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Stipulation/Motion to Dismiss. Stipulation or Motion to Dismiss Due: 60 days. | 11-35303 | |
01/10/2012 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. | 12-00912 | |
01/12/2012 | Settlement Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal/Stipulation/Settlement. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, "this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. | 12-01263 |