judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MONROE (DAIMON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 58171
Short Caption:MONROE (DAIMON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 66660 , 66661 , 66661-COA , 74943 , 74943-COA , 75194 , 75194-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C241570Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/31/2013How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/18/2011Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
04/18/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) C241570 MONROE 11-11493
04/18/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days 11-11495
04/28/2011Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 11-12495
05/10/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. 11-13739
05/10/2011Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/26/08; 6/30/08; 7/24/08; 7/31/08; 10/16/08; 4/13/09; 4/14/09; 4/15/09; 4/16/09; 4/17/09; 4/20/09; 4/21/09; 4/22/09; 4/23/09; 3/10/11. To Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. 11-13761
06/24/2011MotionFiled First Motion for Extension of Time To File Opening Briefs Pursuant To NRAP 26(b). 11-18922
06/28/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 28, 2011. 11-19246
11/14/2011MotionFiled Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Briefs Pursuant to NRAP 26(b). 11-35031
11/22/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 27, 2012. 11-36122
12/07/2011MotionFiled Reporter's Requset for Extension for Preparation of Transcripts (Court Reporter Sharon Howard). 11-37512
12/09/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court Reporter Sharon Howard: Certificate of Delivery due: February 16, 2012. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 6, 2012. 11-37790
04/09/2012AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. (STRICKEN PER 6/22/12 ORDER).
04/09/2012MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Appendix. 12-11181
04/09/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. 12-11190
04/10/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the appendix. The appendix was inadvertently filed upon receipt in E-Flex. We therefore will take no action on the pending motion. Respondent: Answering Brief due: May 9, 2012. 12-11351
04/24/2012Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: March 12, 2009. To Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. 12-13040
05/09/2012BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. 12-14775
05/09/2012AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Vol. I. 12-14783
05/09/2012AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Vol. II. 12-14785
05/09/2012MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Transmit Exhibit. 12-14786
05/10/2012MotionFiled Opposition to State's Motion for Provision of Original Exhibit Pursuant to NRAP 30(d). 12-14902
05/31/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. 12-17061
05/31/2012Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
06/15/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Directing District Court Clerk to Transmit Original Exhibit. District court: 30 days to transmit the original exhibit marked as State's Exhibit 32 and described on the exhibit list for district court case number 08C241570 as "Audio CD." 12-18832
06/22/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Striking Appendix, Directing Appellant to File New Appendix, and Setting Schedule for Amended Briefs. We direct the clerk of this court to strike the appendix filed on April 9, 2012. Appellant: 20 days to file and serve an appendix that complies with NRAP 30. Appellant: 40 days to file and serve an amended opening brief. Respondent: 20 days from service of amended opening brief to file and serve an amended answering brief. Appellant: 20 days from service of amended answering brief to file and serve an amended reply brief. 12-19666
06/29/2012ExhibitFiled Exhibit (original). Exhibit: #32.
07/11/2012AppendixFiled Amended Appendix Vol 1. 12-21849
07/11/2012AppendixFiled Amended Appendix Vol 2. 12-21850
07/11/2012AppendixFiled Amended Appendix Vol 3. 12-21851
07/11/2012AppendixFiled Amended Appendix Vol 4. 12-21852
07/11/2012AppendixFiled Amended Appendix Vol 5. 12-21854
07/11/2012AppendixFiled Amended Appendix Vol 6. 12-21855
07/11/2012AppendixFiled Amended Appendix Vol 7. 12-21865
07/11/2012AppendixFiled Amended Appendix Vol 8. 12-21861
07/11/2012AppendixFiled Amended Appendix Vol 9. 12-21862
08/02/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Revised Opening Brief. 12-24443
08/08/2012AppendixFiled Second Amended Appendix Vol 4 (includes missing pages AA615-AA833). 12-24919
08/21/2012BriefFiled Respondent's Amended Answering Brief. 12-26343
09/10/2012BriefFiled Appellant's Revised Reply Brief. 12-28568
09/10/2012Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
12/20/2012MotionFiled Motion for Oral Argument Pursuant to NRAP 27; Declaration of Christina A. DiEdoardo in Support of Motion and Listing Available Dates. 12-40295
05/31/2013Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal for Decision without Oral Argument. Fn1[The court has considered the motion filed on December 20, 2013, request for oral argument is denied.] 13-16066
05/31/2013Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
09/26/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP13-MG/MD/NS 13-28785
10/23/2013RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 13-31859
10/23/2013Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/04/2013RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 30, 2013. 13-31859