Case: A-5633
A-5633
01/17/1956
Application for Writ of Error
JAMES O. WALKER
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/24/1956 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
05/24/1956 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
05/23/1956 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
02/08/1956 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/17/1956 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/13/1956 | Opinion issued | | ||
05/24/1956 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
05/24/1956 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
05/23/1956 | Motion for Rehearing | Filing granted | | |
05/09/1956 | Opinion issued | | ||
02/22/1956 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/08/1956 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/17/1956 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
01/17/1956 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas Employers Insurance Association | Respondent | |
James O. Walker | Petitioner | |
Kearby Peery | Amicus Curiae |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information