judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LVRC HOLDINGS, LLC VS. BREKKA

Case Information: 58164
Short Caption:LVRC HOLDINGS, LLC VS. BREKKACourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 56716
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A551979Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/22/2011 / Haberfeld, StephenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:10/08/2012 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:10/08/2012How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/15/2011Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal (to be forwarded by the district court clerk).
04/15/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) LVRC HOLDINGS vs. BREKKA; et al - A551979 11-11408
04/15/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. 11-11410
04/20/2011Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Santoro Driggs Walch Kearney Holley & Thompson. Check No. 14680.
04/22/2011Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. 11-11980
05/03/2011Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 11-13113
05/03/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service - Certificate of Mailing - Supplement to the Notice of Appeal. 11-13114
05/10/2011Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 5/25/11 11-13818
05/19/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. LVRC HOLDINGS vs. BREKKA - A551979 11-14777
05/31/2011Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 11-15909
06/02/2011Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. 11-16207
06/17/2011Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: March 29, 2011 and April 14, 2011. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins. 11-18055
07/15/2011TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Hawkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/29/11 and 4/14/11. 11-21308
08/31/2011BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. 11-26617
09/01/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendex - Vol 1. 11-26650
09/01/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendex - Vol 2. 11-26652
09/01/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendex - Vol 3. 11-26653
09/01/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendex - Vol 4 (part 1). 11-26654
09/01/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendex - Vol 4 (part 2). 11-26655
09/01/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendex - Vol 5. 11-26656
09/01/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendex - Vol 6. 11-26657
09/01/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendex - Vol 7. 11-26658
09/01/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendex - Vol 8. 11-26659
09/01/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendex - Vol 9. 11-26660
09/01/2011AppendixFiled Joint Appendex - Vol 10. 11-26661
09/21/2011MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. 11-28855
09/21/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion to extend time to file answering brief is approved. Due date: October 31, 2011. 11-28859
10/27/2011BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief and Request for Sanctions.Y 11-33239
11/28/2011BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. 11-36495
11/28/2011Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
04/30/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the Southern Nevada Panel on the next available calendar. 12-13594
08/23/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Monday, October 8, 2012, @ 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument is limited to 30 minutes. 12-26644
09/25/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 12-30266
10/08/2012Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP12-MD/JG/RP
12/21/2012Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn1[The clerk of this court shall modify this docket's caption to conform to the caption of this order, reflecting that Carolyn Quain is a respondent to this appeal.] Fn7[We decline respondents' request for sanctions.] SNP12-MD/MG/RP 12-40410
01/15/2013RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 13-01547
01/15/2013Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/28/2013RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 24, 2013. 13-01547