judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: PROCEDURES FOR CONSIDERING MATTERS FILED WITH THE SUPREME COURT

Administrative Case: ADKT 0212
Short Caption:IN RE: PROCEDURES FOR CONSIDERING MATTERS FILED WITH THE SUPREME COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Case Closed
Filed Date:03/31/1995Public Hearing:
Closed Date:03/25/1999

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/31/1995Administrative CaseFiled Petition. 95-00051
11/15/1995Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing for November 28, 1995, at 10 a.m. ADKT 151, 179, 181, 190, 203, 210, 212 and 214. 95-00052
11/27/1995Administrative CaseFiled Response to Administrative Petition. 95-00053
11/28/1995Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
11/30/1995Administrative CaseFiled Order hearings scheduled for December 4 and 7, 1995, are vacated. Rescheduled for December 15, 1995, at 10:00 a.m. ADKT 151, 179, 181, 190, 203, 210, 212 and 214. 95-00054
12/05/1995Administrative CaseFiled Order a committee is hereby appointed to study procedures and practices employed by the Nevada Supreme Court. Preliminary report due: 90 days. 95-00055
03/25/1999Administrative CaseCase Administratively Closed.