Case Information: 58165 | |||
Short Caption: | TICAS VS. D C TRANSPORT, INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1000165 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/21/2011 / Andrews, Jonathan | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/13/2012 | How Submitted: | On Record And Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/15/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | ||
04/15/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) NOTICE OF APPEAL | 11-11411 | |
04/15/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | 11-11413 | |
04/19/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Southwest Legal Group - check no. 406. | ||
04/21/2011 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Jonathan Andrews. | 11-11841 | |
05/13/2011 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 11-14316 | |
05/13/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge for Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. | 11-14319 | |
05/18/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service for Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 11-14694 | |
05/19/2011 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement. | 11-14833 | |
05/23/2011 | Settlement Notice | Filed Notice: ECAR. Issued Notice to Settlement Judge Jonathan L. Andrews to file Early Case Assessment Report. | 11-15081 | |
05/24/2011 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 11-15320 | |
05/27/2011 | Docketing Statement | Filed Reply to Respondent's Response to Docketing Statement. | 11-15767 | |
05/31/2011 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for July 27, 2011. | 11-15916 | |
07/29/2011 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 11-22897 | |
08/03/2011 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | 11-23340 | |
08/11/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 11-24338 | |
11/01/2011 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 11-33655 | |
11/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 11-33658 | |
11/08/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Compliance. | 11-34463 | |
12/01/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | 11-36884 | |
12/01/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 11-36895 | |
12/21/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant: Reply Brief due: January 10, 2012. | 11-39360 | |
01/04/2012 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 12-00326 | |
01/04/2012 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | ||
11/13/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting Appeal for Decision without Oral Argument. | 12-35766 | |
11/13/2012 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/20/2013 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Cherry, J., dissenting in part and concurring in part. NNP13-JH/RP/MC | 13-05315 | |
02/25/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Bill of Costs. Respondent D C Transport, Inc.'s Request for Costs. | 13-05810 | |
03/05/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $21.40. | 13-06731 | |
03/05/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements allowed and taxed in the amount of $21.40. | 13-06751 | |
03/05/2013 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/13/2013 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 6, 2013. | 13-06751 |