Case: A-5639
A-5639
01/20/1956
Application for Writ of Error
DALLAS RAILWAY AND TERMINAL COMPANY
VERNON A. GOSSETT, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/02/1956 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
10/24/1956 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
04/13/1956 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
04/04/1956 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
02/07/1956 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/20/1956 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/13/1956 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
12/05/1956 | Miscellaneous Motion | Overruled | | |
11/03/1956 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
11/02/1956 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
10/24/1956 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
10/10/1956 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
10/10/1956 | Opinion issued | | ||
04/15/1956 | Letter Filed | | ||
04/13/1956 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
04/04/1956 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
02/29/1956 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/07/1956 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/20/1956 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
01/20/1956 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Vernon A. Gossett, et ux. | Respondent | |
Dallas Railway and Terminal Company | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information