judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SITES (WILLIAM) VS. STATE

Case Information: 58158
Short Caption:SITES (WILLIAM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 51103
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C227737Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/14/2011Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
04/14/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. C227737 SITES 11-11262
05/09/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 11-13596
06/14/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Vols 1 thru 6 (via FTP). 11-17619
06/16/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. (SEALED) Pre-Sentence Investigation Report.
02/24/2012Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn3[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted]. 12-06000
03/21/2012RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 12-08899
03/21/2012Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
04/02/2012RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 29, 2012. 12-08899