judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5637
A-5637
01/18/1956
Application for Writ of Error
GEORGE F. HALL
DURANT MILLING COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/01/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/23/1956Errata FiledPetitioner
01/21/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
01/18/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/03/1956Response to Motion filed
03/01/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/23/1956Errata Filed
01/21/1956Response to Petition
01/18/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/18/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Durant Milling CompanyRespondent
George F. HallPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information