Case Information: 58162 | |||
Short Caption: | JOHNSON VS. NEVEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A632033 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/15/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. | ||
04/15/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 11-11354 | |
07/12/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." | 11-20830 | |
08/10/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-24224 | |
08/10/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/23/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 17, 2011. | 11-24224 |