Case Information: 58153 | |||
Short Caption: | CROSS (JAMES) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 32533 , 42931 , 45194 , 59712 , 66330 , 77223 , 77223-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C139330 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/09/2011 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/14/2011 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
04/14/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. C139330 CROSS | 11-11194 | |
05/09/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. | 11-13606 | |
06/09/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vol 1 thru 6 (via FTP). | 11-17021 | |
06/09/2011 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/13/2011 | Other | Pre-Sentence Investigation Report (SEALED). | ||
09/15/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 11-28122 | |
10/12/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-31306 | |
10/12/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/26/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 19, 2011. | 11-31306 |