judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: SETTING DATES FOR HEARING MATTERS ON THE ADMINISTRATIVE DOCKET

Administrative Case: ADKT 0214
Short Caption:IN RE: SETTING DATES FOR HEARING MATTERS ON THE ADMINISTRATIVE DOCKETCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Case Closed
Filed Date:05/22/1995Public Hearing:11/28/1995 at 10:00 AM (Carson City)
12/15/1995 at 10:00 AM (Carson City)
Closed Date:12/18/1995

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/22/1995Administrative CaseFiled Petition. 95-00047
11/15/1995Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing for November 28, 1995, at 10 a.m. ADKT 151, 179, 181, 190, 203, 210, 212 and 214. 95-00048
11/27/1995Administrative CaseFiled Response to Administrative Petition. 95-00049
11/28/1995Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
11/28/1995Administrative CaseFiled Order additional ADKT hearing scheduled for December 4, 1995. If not completed, another hearing scheduled for December 7, 1995. ADKT 151, 203, 210 and 214.
11/30/1995Administrative CaseFiled Order hearings scheduled for December 4 and 7, 1995, are vacated. Rescheduled for December 15, 1995, at 10:00 a.m. ADKT 151, 179, 181, 190, 203, 210, 212 and 214.
12/15/1995Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
12/18/1995Administrative CaseFiled Order the administrative docket of the Supreme Court to be set for the fourth Thursday of each month commencing January 1, 1996.
12/18/1995Administrative CaseCase Closed.