Case Information: 58196 | |||
Short Caption: | BRICCA VS. FIRST HORIZON HOME LOAN CORP. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A633596 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Justice Hardesty for Justice Gibbons Justice Gibbons for Justice Parraguirre | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/21/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. | ||
04/21/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. FIRST HORIZON vs. BRICCA - A633596 | 11-11864 | |
04/21/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | 11-11866 | |
04/21/2011 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Jacob L. Hafter | ||
04/21/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 15 days. Docketing statement due: 20 days. Opening brief due: 120 days. | 11-11920 | |
04/22/2011 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 11-12010 | |
05/03/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/15/2011. Court Reporter information not provided. | 11-13108 | |
08/16/2011 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | 11-24855 | |
08/18/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 23, 2011. | 11-25123 | |
09/23/2011 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 11-29042 | |
09/23/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 11-29044 | |
10/25/2011 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. | 11-32917 | |
10/25/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due November 23, 2011. | 11-32920 | |
11/23/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | 11-36316 | |
12/13/2011 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | 11-38201 | |
12/13/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The stipulation to extend to file reply brief is approved. Due date: January 23, 2012. | 11-38262 | |
01/24/2012 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | 12-02506 | |
01/24/2012 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | ||
07/06/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Disassociation of Counsel. | 12-21286 | |
12/12/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." FMP-KP/MG/JH. | 12-39270 | |
01/10/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 13-01036 | |
01/10/2013 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
01/22/2013 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 15, 2013. | 13-01036 |