judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3826
B-3826
02/05/1973
Application for Writ of Error
R. W. MCKINNEY
NACOGDOCHES INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/07/1974Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedPetitioner
01/31/1974Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/24/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/22/1973Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
06/22/1973Post submission brief filedPetitioner
02/19/1973Response to PetitionPetitioner
02/14/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
02/05/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
02/05/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/17/1974Opinion issued
03/25/1974Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
03/04/1974Mandate issued
02/07/1974Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
01/31/1974Response to Motion filed
01/31/1974Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/24/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/09/1974Opinion issued
06/22/1973Supplemental Brief filed
06/22/1973Post submission brief filed
05/09/1973Document received (See Remarks)
05/09/1973Document received (See Remarks)
02/19/1973Response to Petition
02/14/1973Response to Petition
02/05/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/05/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/05/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
R. W. McKinneyPetitioner
City of HoustonAmicus Curiae
Nacogdoches Independent School DistrictRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information