Case: A-5611
A-5611
01/03/1956
Application for Writ of Error
JULIA L. CREECH, ET AL.
GUY A. THOMPSON, AS TRUSTEE FOR ST. LOUIS, BROWNSVILLE AND MEXICO RAILWAY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/23/1957 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
12/10/1956 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
11/26/1956 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
10/29/1956 | Supplement to Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
10/18/1956 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
05/21/1956 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
05/19/1956 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | | |
04/07/1956 | Brief in Support of Petition | Intervenor | | |
03/29/1956 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
01/27/1956 | Response to Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
01/24/1956 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | | |
01/21/1956 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
01/14/1956 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/03/1956 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/17/1957 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
10/16/1957 | Motion to Withdraw Filed | | ||
03/31/1957 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
01/23/1957 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
01/09/1957 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
01/09/1957 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
01/09/1957 | Opinion issued on motion for rehearing | | ||
12/10/1956 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
11/26/1956 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
10/29/1956 | Supplement to Motion for Rehearing | | ||
10/18/1956 | Motion for Rehearing | | ||
10/03/1956 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
10/03/1956 | Concurring Opinion issued. | | ||
10/03/1956 | Opinion issued | | ||
06/02/1956 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
05/21/1956 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
05/19/1956 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
04/25/1956 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/07/1956 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
04/05/1956 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
03/29/1956 | Motion for Rehearing | Filing granted | | |
01/27/1956 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
01/24/1956 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
01/21/1956 | Reply to Response | | ||
01/14/1956 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/03/1956 | Additional Copies received | | ||
01/03/1956 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
01/03/1956 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Morris, Underwood and Oldham | Intervenor | |
R. W. Fairchild | Amicus Curiae | |
Julia L. Creech, et al. | Petitioner | |
Guy A. Thompson, as Trustee for St. Louis, Brownsville and Mexico Railway Company | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information