Case Information: 58185 | |||
Short Caption: | MEDLAR (DOUGLAS) VS. NEVEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 40252 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C173821 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/15/2011 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/20/2011 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
04/20/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. C173821 MEDLAR | 11-11719 | |
05/05/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due date: 10 days. Notice of Entry of Decision and Order filed on or about 03/08/2011. | 11-13362 | |
05/12/2011 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Notice of Entry of Decision and Order filed on 03/08/2011. | 11-14163 | |
07/21/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. | 11-22036 | |
08/15/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Vol 1. | 11-24808 | |
08/15/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Vol 2. | 11-24666 | |
08/15/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Vol 3. | 11-24667 | |
08/15/2011 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/18/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation (PSI) Report (SEALED). | ||
08/22/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk - Pre-Sentence Investigation (PSI) Report (SEALED). | ||
08/25/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk - CORRECTED Pre-Sentence Investigation (PSI) Report (SEALED). | ||
08/30/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Re: Entry of Written Judgment or Order. District Court Order due: 30 days. | 11-26472 | |
10/11/2011 | Order/Incoming | Filed District court order. Copy of Order Dismissing Postconviction Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed in district court on 10/10/11. | 11-31225 | |
12/07/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." | 11-37472 | |
01/04/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-00301 | |
01/04/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/24/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 11, 2012. | 12-00301 |