judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLLINS VS. DOTTA

Case Information: 34953
Short Caption:COLLINS VS. DOTTACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A366519Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/21/2000 / Robinson, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/28/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/12/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lyles & Associates--check no. 26033.
10/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09869
10/26/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James R. Crockett, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/21/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: David K. Robinson.
09/05/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-15581
09/05/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
09/12/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-16010
09/18/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-16393
09/27/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-17070
01/09/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: February 12, 2001. 01-00506
02/13/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 2/12/01. 01-02829
02/13/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 01-02830
03/08/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 13, 2001. 01-04274
04/16/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 04/13/01. 01-06497
05/14/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: June 13, 2001. 01-07966
06/14/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 06/13/01. 01-09973
06/14/2001Case Status Update Briefing Completed.
06/28/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 01-10995
06/28/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/17/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We determine that the district court did not abuse its discretion in entering the default judgment without a prove-up hearing. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1[Collins also contends that the entry of default against him was error because he had conceded liability. The record reflects, however, that his answer was stricken as a discovery sanction under NRCP 37 for his failure to comply with an order compelling his appearance at a deposition. We conclude that upon the striking of the answer, the entry of default was appropriate under NRCP 55(a).] Young and Leavitt, JJ. Agosti, J., dissenting. SNPO2-CY/DA/ML 01-21139
01/14/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00521
01/14/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/01/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 17, 2002. 02-00521