judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTINE A. LINDSEY v. CAROL PEITERSEN HARRIET and DONALD PEITERSEN

Case Heading (S-10-0046)
Case Number:S-10-0046Case Docketed On:02/25/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Trusts (Title 4)
Short Title:CHRISTINE A. LINDSEY v. CAROL PEITERSEN HARRIET and DONALD PEITERSEN
Full Title:CHRISTINE A. LINDSEY, Appellant (Defendant), v. CAROL PEITERSEN HARRIET and DONALD PEITERSEN, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChristine A. LindseyAnn M. Rochelle
AppelleeCarol Peitersen HarrietTimothy J. Kirven
AppelleeDonald PeitersenTimothy J. Kirven

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Estates - Trusts
Opinion Number:2011 WY 80
Citation:255 P.3d 873

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/25/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/25/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/17/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant - Lindsey; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (Corrected)Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
04/28/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees; and received copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/12/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/13/2010Motion - Consolidate (with district court case).MotionConsolidateFinal
05/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant - Lindsey and Appellant-Lindsey's Motion to Consolidate CasesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Ann Rochelle for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Timothy Kirven for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/20/2010Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's opposition to motion to consolidate casesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/24/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/24/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-IV, Original Papers; Volume V, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/24/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/08/2010Order - Denying Motion to ConsolidateOrderDenyFinal
06/15/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Ann M. Rochelle for appellant; Timothy J. Kirven for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/15/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/13/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/01/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/01/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/03/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/2/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal