judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MOMOLU STEWART V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0367
Short Caption:MOMOLU STEWART V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL8176-97Filed Date:03/14/2011

Opening Event Date:03/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/06/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/15/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/26/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/28/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMomolu Stewart YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Michelle D. Thomas YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/05/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 14, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
04/06/2011RECORD INDEX
04/06/2011RECORD COPIES
04/06/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/04/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/09/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/09/2011APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
07/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to August 15, 2011 (Appellee)
08/02/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until August 15, 2011.
08/15/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/15/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/15/2011FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellee)Granted
09/06/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
09/16/2011FiledOrder Granting appellee's motion to supplement the record
09/28/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #1 (Tab A motion to vacate sentence and grant a new trial pursuant to DC Code 23-110 filed 8/24/00;Tab B Gov't opposition to defendant's motion to vacate sentence and grant a new trial filed 5/7/01)
10/17/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/13/2011FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)
01/03/2012FiledOrder Denying pro se aplt's motion for oral argument.
01/26/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Oberly, Beckwith, Farrell
02/14/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and farrell, Senior Judge.)
03/07/2012FiledMandate
04/02/2012LodgedPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
04/02/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Petition for Rehearing/ Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
04/20/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (Appellant)Granted
05/03/2012FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
05/03/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
12/18/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
12/28/2012FiledMandate