judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SUDAR VS. ROCHE

Case Information: 34967
Short Caption:SUDAR VS. ROCHECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D155764Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/06/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/14/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert C. Sudar--Travelers Express M.O. no. 72953000087.
10/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09949
11/03/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-10761
12/06/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 through 3. Mailed on 12/01/99. 99-12134
12/06/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/18/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper perosn, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-02580
03/15/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 3. 00-04070
03/15/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/27/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 22, 2000. 00-04070