judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERIC DWAYNE SILAS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0390
Short Caption:ERIC DWAYNE SILAS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD9851-10Filed Date:03/28/2011

Opening Event Date:03/28/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/05/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/01/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEric Dwayne Silas Y
John A. Briley, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Erik KenersonNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/28/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/29/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) John Briley, Jr., Esquire
04/05/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that John Briley, Jr., Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to March 29, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
05/05/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (89pgs/Tape) 2/25/11 proc.
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (88pgs/Tape) 2/28/11 proc. w/CD
05/10/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT
05/10/2011RECEIVED- statement regarding transcripts
05/12/2011RECORD INDEX
05/12/2011RECORD COPIES
06/02/2011ORD GR MOT FOR LV TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCIPT and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
06/02/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
07/08/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 40 days. no oppo
07/21/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief
08/30/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/14/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to file the lodged appellant's brief and limited appendix
09/14/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/14/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/14/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
10/17/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
01/09/2012FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
01/09/2012FiledAffirmed
02/01/2012FiledMandate