judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-2746
B-2746
05/26/1971
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY
MARGIE YOUNGBLOOD, ET VIR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/10/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/02/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
05/26/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/09/1971Letter Filed
08/23/1971Response to Motion filed
08/10/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/02/1971Response to Petition
05/26/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/26/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Margie Youngblood, et virRespondent
Texas General Indemnity CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information