judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRADFORD VS. HOGAN

Case Information: 34955
Short Caption:BRADFORD VS. HOGANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D213115Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/05/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/12/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09877
10/12/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/21/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from William R. Bradford--Community Bank Cashier's Check No. 216408.
01/28/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Associate Dexter L. Anderson, Attorney at law, Utah State Bar #84 as Counsel for Defendant in his Appeal to the Supreme Court of Nevada from the judgment in the District Court for Clark County, Nevada. 00-01474
02/10/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Substitution of Attorneys. Karen Marie Bradford (Hogan) in proper person in place and stead of Ronald H. Reynolds of Callister & Reynolds. 00-02114
03/08/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-03622
03/15/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 28, 2000, Nevada attorney Peter L. Flangas entered his appearance as counsel for appellant, and moved to associate Utah attorney Dexter L. Anderson in this appeal. We grant the unopposed motion. Attorney Anderson shall be permitted to appear in this matter on behalf of appellant. The clerk shall list Nevada attorney Flangas as attorney of record. Flangas shall be responsible for all matters presented herein by appellant. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix within 45 days of the date of this order. Briefing shall proceed according to NRAP 31(a)(1). We deny as moot appellant's proper person motion for an extension of time submitted on February 3, 2000. On February 10, 2000, respondent filed a document entitled "Substitution of Attorneys," requesting to substitute the respondent in proper person for attorney Ronald H. Reynolds. fn2[Although respondent has not been granted leave to file documents in proper person, we have considered the document received from respondent, and the clerk of this court filed that document.] We approve the notice and direct the clerk to remove attorney Reynolds from the docket as attorney for respondent. Respondent shall, within 30 days of the date of this order, retain new counsel for this mater and cause counsel to enter an appearnace with this court. 00-04103
03/23/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Mailed on 03/20/00. 00-04622
04/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. In a letter received April 7, 2000, respondent informed this court that she would not be retaining counsel for this matter. Appellant's opening brief and appendix remain due to be filed and served on or before April 29, 2000. Accordingly, respondent not having been granted, nor having requested, permission to file documents with this court under NRAP 46(b), this matter shall be submitted for decision upon receipt of the opening brief and appendix. 00-06856
04/28/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-06933
05/05/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Appellant's opening brief and appendix provisionally submitted on May 3, 2000, shall be filed, forthwith. 00-07361
05/05/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. 00-07203
05/05/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-07204
05/05/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Submitted on the opening brief and appendix.
05/12/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
05/22/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (Although counsel signed docketing statement the verification is not completely filled out.) 00-08567
11/01/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Dexter L. Anderson and Peter L. Flangas regarding status of this appeal. Per AH.
11/09/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. responding to letter received by Andy Horstmanshoff. 00-19745
11/16/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-20133
11/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall within 10 days from the date of this order, inform this court in writing whether he desires this court to approve the stipulation and to dismiss this appeal. 00-20469
12/08/2000Other Other. Filed letter from attorney Dexter L. Anderson in response to this court's order filed 11/21/00. 00-21524
12/08/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Copy of Order of Dismissal filed in district court on December 7, 2000. 00-21529
12/08/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to stipulation of the parties filed November 16, 2000, and appellant's response filed December 8, 2000, this appeal is dismissed. SNP/CLK 00-21536
12/08/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
12/13/2000RemittiturIssued Return Letter. Returned Record on Appeal this day. 00-21766
01/10/2001RemittiturFiled Letter: Entered Receipt for Documents. Received by County Clerk on December 21, 2000. 00-21766