judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRANCIS WEBER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0049)
Case Number:S-10-0049Case Docketed On:03/01/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Hot Springs CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:FRANCIS WEBER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:FRANCIS WEBER, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFrancis WeberVance Tyler Countryman
Cynthia Kay Van Vleet
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
Thomas W. Rumpke

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Governmental Claims
Opinion Number:2011 WY 127
Citation:261 P.3d 225 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/01/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/01/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/15/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/15/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
05/14/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received -Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/28/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee State of WyomingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/13/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record, SupplementalNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
07/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/21/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volumes IV-VI, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/10/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/18/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Vance T. Countryman for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas W. Rumpke for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/24/2010Notice-Internal - Recusal memo -Justice VoigtNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
08/26/2010Order - Assignment of judge Norman E. Young, District JudgeOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
09/23/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke, and Young, DJ (Vance T. Countryman and Cynthia Kay Van Vleet, argument by Mr. Countryman for appellant; Thomas W. Rumpke, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/23/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/12/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order - reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/28/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/28/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/03/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal