Case Information: 11-CV-0369 | |||
Short Caption: | T.E. NORRIS CONSTRUCTION, INC. V. COMMUNITY CONNECTIONS,INC. | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CAB1262-10 | Filed Date: | 03/18/2011 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 03/18/2011 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 03/25/2011 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 06/08/2011 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 01/18/2012 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 02/24/2012 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | T.E. Norris Construction Inc. | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | Community Connection Inc. | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
03/18/2011 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
03/25/2011 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (11-pgs/tape 6/18/10 proc.)w/cd | |||
03/25/2011 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
03/28/2011 | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 6/18/10) (elp) | |||
03/31/2011 | On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 18, 2011, the statement regarding transcript and it appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a) (1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp | |||
04/01/2011 | RECORD INDEX | |||
05/04/2011 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
05/04/2011 | APPENDIX | |||
06/08/2011 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
06/08/2011 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
06/16/2011 | Filed | Final Screening-Regular | ||
06/27/2011 | APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF | |||
06/30/2011 | It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk | |||
11/30/2011 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
01/18/2012 | Filed | Argued before Judges Washington, Easterly, Farrell Stanley R. Jacobs, Esq. for appellant Peter Martinez, Esq. for appellee | ||
01/31/2012 | Filed | Affirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Easterly, Associate Judge, and Farrell, Senior Judge.) | ||
02/24/2012 | Filed | Mandate |