judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION v. JAMES T. ROBBINS

Case Heading (S-10-0048)
Case Number:S-10-0048Case Docketed On:03/01/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION v. JAMES T. ROBBINS
Full Title:STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellant (Defendant), v. JAMES T. ROBBINS, Appellee (Complainant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDepartment of TransportationBruce A. Salzburg
Robin Sessions Cooley
Michael Thomas Kahler
Douglas J. Moench
AppelleeJames RobbinsMike Cornia

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Constitutional Law
Opinion Number:2011 WY 23
Citation:246 P.3d 864

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/01/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/01/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
04/19/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant, State of Wyoming, Department of Transportation; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/20/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/14/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/23/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
06/24/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Michael T. Kahler, Assistant Attorney General for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mike Cornia for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/18/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Michael T. Kahler, Assistant Attorney General for appellant; Mike Cornia for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/18/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
08/23/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/10/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order - reversing, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/28/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/28/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/04/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/2/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal