judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

PAUL RAY GUIDRY v. FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, NECHES BUTANE PRODUCTS COMPANY, NECHES BUTANE PRODUCTS CO. AND FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION

Case: B-2770
B-2770
06/04/1971
Application for Writ of Error
PAUL RAY GUIDRY
FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, NECHES BUTANE PRODUCTS COMPANY, NECHES BUTANE PRODUCTS CO. AND FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/28/1972Supplement to Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/21/1972Response to Brief filedRespondent
01/17/1972Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/13/1972Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/24/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
06/04/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/05/1972Motion to Withdraw Filed
03/13/1972Letter Filed
02/28/1972Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
01/26/1972Response to Motion filed
01/21/1972Response to Brief filed
01/20/1972Response to Motion filed
01/17/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/17/1972Response to Motion filed
01/13/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/05/1972Opinion issued
10/06/1971Document received (See Remarks)
06/24/1971Response to Petition
06/16/1971Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
06/04/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/04/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Neches Butane Products CompanyRespondent
Liberty Mutual Insurance CompanyIntervenor
Neches Butane Products Co. and Foster Wheeler CorporationRespondent
Paul Ray GuidryPetitioner
Foster Wheeler CorporationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information