judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STEVEN ROSEN V. AMERICAN ISRAEL PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMM., ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0368
Short Caption:STEVEN ROSEN V. AMERICAN ISRAEL PUBLIC AFFAIRS COMM., ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB1256-09Filed Date:03/15/2011

Opening Event Date:03/15/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/25/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/14/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/18/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Amicus CuriaeGrant F. SmithNPro SeN
Amicus-AppellantGrant F. SmithNPro SeN
AppellantSteven Rosen N
David H. ShapiroYY
AppelleeAmerican Isreal Public Affairs CommitteeN
Thomas L. McCallyYY
William J. CarterYN
AppelleeHoward Kohr N
Thomas L. McCallyNY
William J. CarterNN
AppelleeMelvin Dow N
Thomas L. McCallyNY
William J. CarterNN
AppelleeBernice Manocherian N
Thomas L. McCallyNY
William J. CarterNN
AppelleeHoward E. Friedman N
Thomas L. McCallyNY
AppelleeLawrence Weinberg N
Thomas L. McCallyNY
William J. CarterNN
AppelleeRobert H. Asher N
Thomas L. McCallyNY
William J. CarterNN
AppelleeEdward C. Levy, Jr.N
Thomas L. McCallyNY
AppelleeLionel Kaplan N
Thomas L. McCallyNY
William J. CarterNN
AppelleeTimothy F. Wuliger N
Thomas L. McCallyNY
William J. CarterNN
AppelleeAmy Rothschild Friedkin N
Thomas L. McCallyNY
William J. CarterNN
AppelleePatrick M. Dorton N
Thomas L. McCallyNY
William J. CarterNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/15/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL (Amended Notice of Appeal filed on March 21, 2011 to include the trial court's order dated October 30, 2009)
03/31/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 15, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
04/05/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
05/03/2011RECORD INDEX
05/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/09/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. app. R. 30 (a)(1) shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
06/20/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/20/2011APPENDIX
07/25/2011FiledBrief (Appellee American Isreal Public Affairs Committee, Appellee Asher, Appellee Dorton, Appellee Dow, Appellee Friedkin, Appellee Friedman, Appellee Kaplan, Appellee Levy, Appellee Manocherian, Appellee Weinberg, Appellee Wuliger)
07/25/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
08/16/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
09/14/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
10/06/2011FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellee American Isreal Public Affairs Committee, Appellee Asher, Appellee Dorton, Appellee Dow, Appellee Friedkin, Appellee Friedman, Appellee Kaplan, Appellee Kohr, Appellee Levy, Appellee Manocherian, Appellee Weinberg, Appellee Wuliger) and enter appearance of William J. CarterGranted
10/21/2011FiledOrder Granting Counsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellees) and enter the appearance of William J. Carter, Esquire
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/13/2012LodgedMotion For Leave to File Brief (Amicus-Appellant)
01/13/2012LodgedBrief (Returned by mail) (Amicus-Appellant)
02/03/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Other (Amicus Curiae Smith, Amicus-Appellant Smith)Granted
02/08/2012FiledOpposition to Grant'Smith's fourth motion for leave to file brief as amicus curiae (Appellee American Isreal Public Affairs Committee, Appellee Asher, Appellee Dorton, Appellee Dow, Appellee Friedkin, Appellee Friedman, Appellee Kaplan, Appellee Kohr, Appellee Levy, Appellee Manocherian, Appellee Weinberg, Appellee Wuliger)
02/14/2012FiledArgued Before Washington,Blackburne-Rigsby,Ferren David H.Shapiro Esq.,for appellant Thomas L.McCally Esq.,for appellee
02/15/2012FiledOrder Granting amicus brief.
02/15/2012FiledBrief (Amicus Curiae) (Amicus Curiae Smith, Amicus-Appellant Smith)
04/26/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Washington, Chief Judge, Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, and Ferren, Senior Judge.) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is affirmed.)
05/18/2012FiledMandate
05/18/2012LodgedReceived courtsey copy of plaintiff's sur reply to defendant's reply to opposition to motin to dismiss filed in superior court (Appellant)