judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROTH VS. LITTON

Case Information: 34954
Short Caption:ROTH VS. LITTONCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35157
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A369429Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/23/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/12/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Carl Roth--check no. 1474.
10/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09873
10/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-10428
11/23/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 through 3. Mailed on 11/18/99. 99-11698
11/23/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " . . . we affirm the district court's judgment." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-16079
10/10/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 3 this day. 00-16196
10/10/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 28, 2000. 00-16196