judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TERRYBERRY VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34984
Short Caption:TERRYBERRY VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33423 , 33442 , 34924 , 36773
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D135368Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Habeas Corpus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/18/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/18/1999Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Extraordinary Writs Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Post-Conviction). 99-10047
12/15/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. " . . . we deny the petition." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-12637
01/11/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-00432
01/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/16/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. By order dated Decemer 15, 1999, this court denied this petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Beginning on January 18, 2000, petitioner submitted a series of documents. We construe these documents as seeking rehearing in this matter, and conclude that rehearing is not warranted. fn1[Although petitioner was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from petitioner.] fn2[We direct the clerk to return any proper person documents submitted by petitioner after the date of this order.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-04184
03/16/2000Other Other. Pursuant to the order filed 3/16/00, we returned, unfiled the original and two copies of numerous proper person documents submitted by appellant Elayne Terryberry.
03/22/2000Other Other. Pursuant to the Order filed 3/16/00, we returned, unfiled the original and two copies of numerous proper person documents submitted by appellant Elayne Terryberry. (Returned same documents that were received on 3/16/00).
03/24/2000Other Other. Returned, unfiled with letter: original and two copies of Second Petition for Rehearing pursuant to order filed 3/16/00.