judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TERENCE ROLLINS V. ASSOCIATES FOR RENEWAL IN EDUCATION

Case Information: 11-AA-0404
Short Caption:TERENCE ROLLINS V. ASSOCIATES FOR RENEWAL IN EDUCATIONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00265-11Filed Date:04/01/2011

Opening Event Date:04/01/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/22/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/29/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerTerence Rollins YPro SeN
RespondentAssociates for Renewal in EducationN
Squire PadgettNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/01/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
04/01/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
04/12/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to April 1, 2011. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
04/12/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
05/03/2011LETTER stating that Jermaine Boston will re- present respondent, Ms. Boston is not an Atty.
05/27/2011 ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 9D.C. 2001); D.C. APP. R. 15 (A)(5). Failure to compyo with this order may result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
06/08/2011APPEARANCE of Squire Padgett as counsel for Resp.
07/22/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/transcripts & exhibits
07/22/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/28/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/09/2011FiledOrder directing motion, brief and limited appendix
10/14/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Respondent)Granted
11/02/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Respondent)
11/02/2011FiledDismissed
11/29/2011FiledMandate