judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

SAM PARKS, ET AL. v. BILL ELLIOTT, COUNTY JUDGE OF HARRIS COUNTY, TEXAS, CITY OF HOUSTON, LOUIE WELCH, MAYOR, AND THE CITY COUNCIL OF THE CITY OF HOUSTON, HOUSTON EASTEX WATER SUPPLY CORPORATION

Case: B-2737
B-2737
05/19/1971
Application for Writ of Error
SAM PARKS, ET AL.
BILL ELLIOTT, COUNTY JUDGE OF HARRIS COUNTY, TEXAS, CITY OF HOUSTON, LOUIE WELCH, MAYOR, AND THE CITY COUNCIL OF THE CITY OF HOUSTON, HOUSTON EASTEX WATER SUPPLY CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
08/11/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/04/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
06/03/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
05/31/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
05/19/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
08/17/1971Response to Motion filed
08/11/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/04/1971Response to Petition
06/03/1971Response to Petition
05/31/1971Response to Petition
05/19/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/19/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Houston Eastex Water Supply CorporationRespondent
City of Houston, Louie Welch, Mayor, and the City Council of the City of HoustonRespondent
Sam Parks, et al.Petitioner
Bill Elliott, County Judge of Harris County, TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information