Case Information: 12-AA-1406 | |||
Short Caption: | ROCK CREEK PLAZA & THE WOODNER APARTMENTS, ET AL V. D.C. WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | 74958-0 | Filed Date: | 08/24/2012 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/24/2012 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 11/09/2012 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | Rock Creek Plaza & The Woodner Apartments | N |
| ||||||
Petitioner | 3636 Woodner Limited Partnership | N |
| ||||||
Respondent | D.C. Water & Sewer Authority |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
08/24/2012 | Filed | Petition For Review | ||
08/24/2012 | Filed | Filing Fee Paid $100.00 | ||
08/24/2012 | Filed | Service Of Petition On Agency/Bd | ||
09/12/2012 | Filed | Initial Order - directing record | ||
10/02/2012 | Filed | Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Petitioner 3636 Woodner Limited Partnership, Petitioner Rock Creek Plaza & The Woodner Apartments) | Granted | |
10/11/2012 | Filed | Order Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Petitioner 3636 Woodner Limited Partnership, Petitioner Rock Creek Plaza & The Woodner Apartments) | ||
10/11/2012 | Filed | Dismissed | ||
11/09/2012 | Filed | Mandate |