judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DUDO (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34983
Short Caption:DUDO (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38476 , 57664
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 98C149612Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/28/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/18/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/18/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-10043
11/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We direct the attorney general to obtain and transmit to this court, within 30 days from the date of this order, certified copies of any available prison records indicating the actual date upon which appellant delivered his notice of appeal to a prison official. If the prison records do not indicate that appellant delivered his notice of appeal to a prison official, the attorney general shall so inform this court. 99-11549
12/20/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Court Order. 99-12939
01/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-00187
01/06/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Original Affidavit of Michael McGarrah. 00-00240
03/23/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 03/21/00. 00-04717
03/23/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/21/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Remand, alternatively to Stay Proceedings. 00-06438
07/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 18, 1999, appellant filed a proper person notice of appeal. On April 21, 2000, attorney Gary Gowen appeared in this court and filed a motion of remand, alternatively to stay proceedings in this court. We have considered the motion and conclude the requested relief is not warranted. Counsel shall have 30 days to file an opening brief in this court. Briefing shall proceed with NRAP 31(a)(1). We note that a record on appeal has already been filed in this matter. Therefore, a joint appendix is not required and the parties shall cite to the record on appeal. Counsel's prompt compliance with NRAP 9 is required, and appellant shall file a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request in this court within 10 days from the date of this order. 00-12860
08/14/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Proof of Ordering Rough Draft Transcripts. 00-14171
08/31/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: August 31, 2000. 00-15447
08/31/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 8/28/00. 00-15449
09/28/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-17135
10/19/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 10/17/00. 00-18536
12/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-22599
12/28/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-11820
07/27/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/27/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: July 25, 2001. 01-12768
08/07/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-13353
08/23/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-13438
08/23/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/17/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 10, 2001. 01-13438