judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BOWERS OIL AND GAS, INC., a Colorado corporation, v. DCP DOUGLAS, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company; and KINDER MORGAN OPERATING, L.P. "A", a Delaware limited partnership

Case Heading (S-11-0233)
Case Number:S-11-0233Case Docketed On:10/11/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:BOWERS OIL AND GAS, INC., a Colorado corporation, v. DCP DOUGLAS, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company; and KINDER MORGAN OPERATING, L.P. "A", a Delaware limited partnership
Full Title:BOWERS OIL AND GAS, INC., a Colorado corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. DCP DOUGLAS, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company; and KINDER MORGAN OPERATING, L.P. "A", a Delaware limited partnership, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBowers Oil and Gas, Inc.Loyd Edgar Smith
AppelleeDCP Douglas, LLCJames Robert Belcher
AppelleeKinder Morgan Operating, L.P. "A"James Robert Belcher

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts
Opinion Number:2012 WY 103
Citation:281 P.3d 734

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/11/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/11/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/21/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time of file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/21/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/05/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/05/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
01/06/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/06/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Stipulated motion for extension of time to file response brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/09/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/27/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/27/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Response Brief of DCP Douglas, LLC and Kinder Morgan Operation, L.P. "A"EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/07/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/08/2012Motion - Extension of time - brief (reply)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/08/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Unopposed Motin for Extension of Time to File Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/08/2012Order - Denying appellant's request for extension to file reply briefOrderDenyFinal
02/09/2012Event - Phone Call to counsel re denialEventPhone CallFinal
02/14/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/14/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/15/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/16/2012Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
02/16/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion to Vacate and Reset Oral Argument (by Appellant)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/21/2012Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
02/23/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/23/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Depositions, Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/05/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/12/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from James R. Belcher obo AppelleesNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/12/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Loyd Smith obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/17/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Loyd Smith for Appellant and James Belcher for Appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/17/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/31/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/02/2012Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
08/02/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Request of DCP Douglas and Kinder Morgan for Costs of Publishing Brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/29/2012Order - Awarding costsOrderAwarding costsFinal
08/29/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/29/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/29/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/05/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/4/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal