judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MINSKOFF (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38419
Short Caption:MINSKOFF (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR011149Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/31/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/31/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-14828
11/15/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 01-19125
12/06/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw from Representation. 01-20503
12/06/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. (appendix attached and late)
12/26/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-21720
01/11/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 26, 2001, counsel for appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement. The motion is granted. fn1[The granting of this motion is conditioned upon trial counsel's full cooperation with appellate counsel during the pendency of this appeal.] The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on December 26, 2001. On December 6, 2001, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record. Because counsel for appellant has fulfilled the obligations placed on trial counsel by NRAP 3C(b), the motion is granted. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days within which to appoint counsel for appellant. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from appointment or appearance of appellate counsel the district court clerk shall: (1) transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order; and (2) serve a copy of this order of remand on appellate counsel. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days to file a notice of appearance with the clerk of this court. Appellate counsel may file a supplemental fast track statement. Such supplemental fast track statement must be filed within 20 days of appellate counsel's appointment. 02-00796
01/11/2002Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-21721
01/11/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-21722
01/24/2002Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order for Proof of Indigency or Retention of Counsel filed in district court on January 22, 2002. 02-01699
02/12/2002Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed copy of order filed in district court on 2/7/02 appointing Washoe County Public Defender as counsel for appellant. 02-02779
02/21/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Washoe County Public Defender as counsel for appellant. 02-03308
02/22/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track respone has been filed. Counsel for respondent shall file and serve the fast track response within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for respondent should not be sanctioned. 02-03413
02/28/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Cheryl Bond, Appellate Deputy, elects not to file a supplemental fast track statement. 02-03732
03/04/2002Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 02-03891
03/29/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-05627
04/23/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-05758
04/23/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/02/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 26, 2002. 02-05758