judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TERRY M. LIGGINS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0438
Short Caption:TERRY M. LIGGINS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Lead: 11-CO-0381 Consolidated:11-CO-0438
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL7633-01Filed Date:03/14/2011

Opening Event Date:03/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/06/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/12/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/01/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/14/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTerry M. Liggins YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/05/2011ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 11-CO-381 and 11-CO-438 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order addressing the issues raised in appeal no. 11-CO-438, will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, the record index and record copies required by D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
05/06/2011RECORD INDEX (11CO438)
05/06/2011RECORD COPIES (11CO438)
05/06/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/26/2011ORDERED: That appellant's brief, addressing the issues raised in appeal no. 11-CO-438, shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's consolidated brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. (By: JAC)
06/23/2011APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to Court's Order date 5/26/11.
07/14/2011FiledOrdered that the appellant's brief filed in appeal no. 11-co-381 is considered as the consolidated brief for these appeals and directing appellee's brief
08/12/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/12/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief to September 16, 2011 (Served by: DCCA on 8/23/11). Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion to file the reply brief and the lodged reply brief
09/15/2011Filedreply brief (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
10/11/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte scheduling on Summary Calendar.
10/11/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/01/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Fisher, Pryor
11/15/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Oberly, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
12/01/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
02/02/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se petition for reh/reh en banc
02/14/2012FiledMandate
02/17/2012FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari Filed in US Supreme Court on 2/9/12 #11-8842. (Appellant)
03/20/2012FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)