judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HENRY N. KASPER, RIDGELL JACKSON KELLER v. AETNA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case: B-2722
B-2722
05/12/1971
Application for Writ of Error
HENRY N. KASPER, RIDGELL JACKSON KELLER
AETNA INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/05/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/28/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/25/1971Response to PetitionPetitioner
05/21/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
05/20/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
05/12/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/09/1971Response to Motion filed
08/05/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/29/1971Response to Motion filed
07/28/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/25/1971Response to Petition
05/21/1971Response to Petition
05/20/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/12/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/12/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
AETNA INSURANCE COMPANYRespondent
Ridgell Jackson KellerPetitioner
Henry N. KasperPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information