judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HENDERSON VS. CITY OF WINNEMUCCA

Case Information: 38418
Short Caption:HENDERSON VS. CITY OF WINNEMUCCACourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39334 , 39581
Lower Court Case(s):Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CV0015117Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/14/2001 / Gruesen, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/31/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from G. David Robertson, Esq.--check no. 7954.
08/31/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14793
09/14/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15544
09/14/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas W. Gruesen, Sr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/04/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-16738
10/15/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Motion for Extension of Time. 01-17421
10/18/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal., Returned, with letter (pursuant to NRAP 27(a)).
11/08/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-18661
11/21/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). fn1[Respondent's October 4, 2001 motion to dismiss this appeal is denied as moot.] NNP/CLK 01-19554
11/21/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.