judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL PATTERSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0246)
Case Number:S-11-0246Case Docketed On:10/25/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:MICHAEL PATTERSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MICHAEL PATTERSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael PattersonDiane M. Lozano
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
Paul S. Rehurek
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2012 WY 90
Citation:279 P.3d 535

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/25/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/25/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/12/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/12/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/27/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/30/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/02/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/15/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/16/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/01/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Original Supreme Court Record in S-07-0005 - containing 6 volumes.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/01/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/26/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/28/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for 6/27/2012 by agent for warden at WSP.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
07/12/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/12/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/12/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/12/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/16/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Mandate signed for by agent for warden at WSP 7/13/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
07/17/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/16/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal