judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AHMAD RASHEED V. TERRY PIERCE

Case Information: 11-CV-0417
Short Caption:AHMAD RASHEED V. TERRY PIERCEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB2839-10Filed Date:03/29/2011

Opening Event Date:03/29/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAhmad Rasheed YPro SeN
AppelleeTerry Pierce N
Joan M. WilbonNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/29/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/27/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS FROM the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been IMPROPERLY FILED since an appealable order has not been identified. (BY: ETW)
05/24/2011 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS DISMISSED. Patterson v. DC, 08-CV-189... (BY: ETW) LW
05/24/2011DISMISSED
05/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION aplt's response to show cause order dated 4/27/11 (Titled: Petioner to clearify petition's position LW
07/13/2011FiledOrder To Show Cause
09/07/2011FiledOrder Denying MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION